Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/05/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/05/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 02/12/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/12/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/12/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/12/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/12/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/12/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/12/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/12/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/12/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/12/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/12/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/12/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/13/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/25/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/25/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/04/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/04/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/04/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/04/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/11/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/11/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/11/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/11/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/11/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/11/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/11/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/21/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/21/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/21/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/08/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/14/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/14/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/14/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/14/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/07/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/07/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/07/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/05/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/05/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/05/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/05/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/12/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/12/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/12/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/09/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/09/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/08/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/08/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/10/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/10/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/10/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/10/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/16/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/16/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/16/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/26/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/26/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/12/1998