Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/12/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/20/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/20/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/22/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/23/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/23/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/25/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/25/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/29/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/30/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/03/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/05/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/05/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/05/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/08/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/17/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/17/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/17/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/18/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/18/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/18/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/26/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/26/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/30/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/30/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/30/1997