Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/11/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/12/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/12/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/18/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/20/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/20/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/23/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/15/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/22/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/22/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/22/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/22/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 07/22/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/23/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/23/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/23/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/23/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/24/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/25/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/25/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/29/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/30/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/03/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/03/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/05/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/05/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/05/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 09/08/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/10/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/17/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/17/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/17/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/17/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/17/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/17/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/17/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/17/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/17/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/17/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/17/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/17/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/17/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 09/17/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/18/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/18/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/18/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/18/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/18/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/18/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/18/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/23/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/26/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/26/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/26/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/26/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/30/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/30/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/30/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/30/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/30/1997