Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/20/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/25/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/09/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/09/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/09/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/15/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/15/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/16/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/09/1998