Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/11/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/11/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/11/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/11/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/11/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 06/11/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/11/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/15/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/16/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/22/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/30/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/21/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/13/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 01/27/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/24/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/25/1998