Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/12/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/17/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/17/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/25/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 07/25/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/25/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/31/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/31/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/05/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/05/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/15/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/26/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/09/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/09/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/24/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/04/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/04/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/04/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 11/09/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 11/09/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/09/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/12/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/12/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/13/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/24/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/26/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/26/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/26/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/17/1998