Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/12/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/23/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/23/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/23/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/23/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/23/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/23/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/23/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/23/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/23/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/09/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/09/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/21/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/21/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/22/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/08/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 11/08/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/08/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/08/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/08/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/08/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/04/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/04/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/04/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/04/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/04/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/25/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 03/11/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/19/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/19/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/19/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/19/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/19/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/19/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/19/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/01/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/01/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/05/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/15/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 08/06/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/06/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/09/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/01/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew