Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/18/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/19/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/19/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/19/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/24/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/25/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/09/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/10/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/29/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/03/1997