Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/17/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large]* 06/17/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 06/17/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/11/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/11/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/11/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/11/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 07/11/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/11/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/11/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/11/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/11/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/11/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/05/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/05/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/11/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/11/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/26/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/26/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/26/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/26/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/26/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/26/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/26/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/26/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/26/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/26/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/26/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/26/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/26/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/28/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 11/07/1997