Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/28/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/31/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/31/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/05/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/06/1998