Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/18/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/18/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/20/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/20/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/23/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/23/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/23/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/23/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/23/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/23/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/09/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/09/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/09/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/09/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/09/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/10/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/10/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/10/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/10/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/10/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/17/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/17/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/17/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/17/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/30/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/30/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/30/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/30/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/31/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/10/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/10/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/18/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/18/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/18/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/25/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/25/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/21/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/21/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/21/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/21/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/21/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 11/05/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/05/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/28/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/28/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/28/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/28/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 01/28/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/05/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/05/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/05/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/05/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/10/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/10/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/26/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 03/26/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/26/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/26/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/27/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/27/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/27/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/29/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/29/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/29/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/29/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/30/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/30/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/30/1998
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/30/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/19/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/19/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/04/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/04/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/04/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/04/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/04/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/25/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/14/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/03/1998