Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 06/19/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/19/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/19/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/11/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/11/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/15/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/15/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/24/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/25/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/24/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/22/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/29/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/12/1998