Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/31/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/31/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/31/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/31/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/31/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/31/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/31/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/11/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/11/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/25/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/25/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/23/1998