Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/20/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/20/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/20/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/20/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/20/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/23/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/23/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/23/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/26/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/26/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/26/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/26/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 07/11/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/11/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/11/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/11/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/11/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/15/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/15/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/15/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/15/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/15/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/16/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/16/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/16/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/16/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/16/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/16/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/16/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/16/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/16/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/16/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/16/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/16/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/17/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/17/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/17/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/17/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/17/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/17/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/23/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/23/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/23/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/23/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/23/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/23/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/23/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/23/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/23/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 07/23/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/23/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/23/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/23/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/23/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/23/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/24/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/24/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/24/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 07/24/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 07/24/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/24/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/24/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/24/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/24/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/25/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/25/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/25/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/25/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/29/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/29/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/29/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/30/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/30/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/30/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/30/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 07/30/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/30/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/31/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 08/01/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/01/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/03/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/03/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/08/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/08/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/08/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/08/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/08/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/08/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/08/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/08/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/08/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/08/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/08/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/08/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 09/08/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/10/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/10/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/10/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/10/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/11/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/11/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/11/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/11/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/11/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/17/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/17/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 09/17/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 09/23/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/23/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/23/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/23/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/26/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/26/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/26/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/26/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/30/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/21/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/24/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/30/1997
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/07/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew