Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/19/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/20/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/20/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/20/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/20/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/20/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/23/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/23/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/26/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/26/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/26/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/11/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/11/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/15/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/15/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/16/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/16/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/17/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/23/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/23/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/24/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/08/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/08/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/10/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/10/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/11/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/11/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/17/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/26/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/24/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/30/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew