Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/24/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/24/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/24/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/24/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/24/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/24/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/26/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/09/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/17/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/17/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/17/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 07/17/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/17/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/17/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/17/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 07/17/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/17/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/22/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/22/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/22/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/22/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/22/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/22/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/23/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew