Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/20/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/20/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 06/20/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 06/20/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 06/20/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/20/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/08/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/08/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/08/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/10/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/22/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/22/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/22/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/23/1997