Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/15/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/23/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/03/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/23/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/23/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/25/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/06/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/06/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/06/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/06/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 10/07/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/07/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/08/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 10/22/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/24/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/28/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/28/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/30/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/30/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/30/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/31/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/04/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/05/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/05/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/08/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/05/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/17/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/17/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/21/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/23/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/23/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/23/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/23/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/23/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/23/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/28/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/12/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/14/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/19/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/19/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/20/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/20/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/20/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/03/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/03/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/03/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/03/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/04/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/05/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/09/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/10/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/11/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/11/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/11/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/11/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/11/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/11/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/11/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/16/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/16/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/16/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/16/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/19/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/24/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/24/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/24/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/29/1998