Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/24/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/14/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/10/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/24/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/28/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/04/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 11/08/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew