Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/02/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/02/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/02/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/02/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/02/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/03/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/10/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/18/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/25/1998