Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 06/25/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/25/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 06/25/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/08/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/08/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/10/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/17/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/17/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/22/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/23/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/23/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/24/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/25/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/30/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/31/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 08/01/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/04/1997