Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 01/28/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/03/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/10/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/28/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/05/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/14/1998