Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/26/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/26/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/26/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/26/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/09/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/09/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/09/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/09/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/09/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/09/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/09/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/29/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/29/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/29/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/29/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/29/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/29/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/29/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/29/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/29/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/31/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/31/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/31/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/31/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/31/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/31/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/05/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/05/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/05/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/05/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/05/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/05/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/29/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/29/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/29/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/29/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/29/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/29/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/29/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/29/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/29/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/29/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 10/21/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 11/13/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/03/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/30/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/17/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/25/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/25/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/25/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/25/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/25/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/25/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/25/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/25/1998