Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/26/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/26/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/08/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/08/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/09/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/23/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/23/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/26/1998