Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/15/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/15/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/15/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/16/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/16/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/16/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/16/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/16/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/16/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/16/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/16/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/16/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/16/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/16/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/21/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/21/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/21/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/21/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/21/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/21/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/21/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/21/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/28/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/28/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/28/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/28/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/28/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/28/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/03/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/03/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/07/1997