Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/14/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/15/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/15/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/15/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/22/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/22/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/22/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/22/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/22/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/22/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/25/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/31/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/31/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/03/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/03/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/03/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/05/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/09/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/10/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/23/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/21/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/29/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/30/1997