Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/15/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 07/15/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/15/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/31/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/21/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/21/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/21/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/06/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/06/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/04/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 02/04/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/04/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/04/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/19/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/19/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/24/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/24/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/22/1998