Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/23/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/07/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/05/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/28/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/24/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/26/1998