Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/23/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/23/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/23/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/23/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/23/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 07/23/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/23/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/23/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/24/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/25/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/25/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/25/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/25/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 07/25/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/25/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/28/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/28/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/28/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 07/28/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/28/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/28/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/30/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/30/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/30/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 07/31/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/05/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/05/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/05/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/10/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/15/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/15/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/15/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/25/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/25/1997