There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Women's Cardiovascular Diseases Research and Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide for expanding, intensifying, and coordinating activities of the National Heart, Lung, and Blood Institute with respect to heart attack, stroke, and other cardiovascular diseases in women.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/09/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/18/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
07/09/1997Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/09/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/09/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/09/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/09/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/09/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/29/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/29/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/13/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 01/27/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/27/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/04/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/04/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/19/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/19/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/19/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/19/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/19/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/19/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/05/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/21/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/10/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce07/09/1997 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment07/18/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2130.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2130. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/09/1997)

Women's Cardiovascular Diseases Research and Prevention Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to mandate expansion, intensification, and coordination of research and related activities of the National Heart, Lung, and Blood Institute with regard to cardiovascular diseases in women. Authorizes appropriations.