Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/15/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/16/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/16/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/17/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/21/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/22/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/22/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/07/1997