Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/05/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/05/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/05/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/05/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/24/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/24/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/12/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/01/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/01/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/01/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/01/1998