There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 1128B of the Social Security Act to repeal the criminal penalty for fraudulent disposition of assets in order to obtain Medicaid benefits added by section 217 of the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/07/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
01/22/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
01/16/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/07/1997Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/07/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/21/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/21/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/21/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/21/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/21/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/21/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/21/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/06/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 02/06/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/06/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/06/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/06/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/06/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/13/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/06/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/06/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/06/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/06/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/06/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/06/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/06/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/06/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/06/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/06/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/06/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/06/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/06/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/06/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/06/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/06/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/06/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/12/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 03/12/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/12/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/13/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/08/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/08/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/16/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/24/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/24/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/10/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/16/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/31/1997

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce01/07/1997 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment01/22/1997 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/07/1997 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health01/16/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.216.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.216. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/07/1997)

Amends title XI of the Social Security Act (SSA) to repeal the criminal penalty added by the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996 for the fraudulent disposition of assets in order to obtain Medicaid benefits under SSA title XIX.