Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/07/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/21/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/21/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/21/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/21/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/21/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/21/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/21/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/06/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 02/06/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/06/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/06/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/06/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/06/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/13/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/06/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/06/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/06/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/06/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/06/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/06/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/06/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/06/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/06/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/06/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/06/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/06/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/06/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/06/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/06/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/06/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/06/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/12/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 03/12/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/12/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/13/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/08/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/08/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/16/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/24/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/24/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/10/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/16/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/31/1997