Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/17/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/17/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/17/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/17/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/29/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 09/04/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/04/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/04/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/04/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/30/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/29/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/06/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/06/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/03/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/03/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/04/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/31/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/29/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/29/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/29/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew