Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/16/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/30/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/07/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/05/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew