Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/08/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/04/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/31/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/15/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/15/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew