Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/28/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/18/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/03/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/31/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew