Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/17/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/28/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/28/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/16/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/30/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/30/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/06/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/03/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/29/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/20/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/05/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/08/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew