Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/17/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/17/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/17/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/17/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/17/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/17/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/28/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/28/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/29/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/29/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/29/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/29/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 09/04/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/04/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/04/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/04/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/08/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/16/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/16/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/18/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/18/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/30/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/30/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/30/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/30/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/30/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/30/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/30/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/30/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/07/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/07/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/07/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/07/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/29/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/29/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/06/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/06/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/06/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/06/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/06/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/07/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/03/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/03/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/03/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/03/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 02/03/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/03/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/03/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/04/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/04/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/04/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/04/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/04/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/31/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/31/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/31/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/31/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/29/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/29/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/29/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/20/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/20/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/20/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/20/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/21/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/05/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/05/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/15/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/15/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/15/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/15/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/08/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew