Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 07/16/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/17/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/28/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/04/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/18/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/29/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/20/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/25/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew