Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/17/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/17/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8]* 07/17/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/25/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/31/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/31/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/31/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/11/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/11/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/11/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/11/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 09/11/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/29/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/06/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/06/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/06/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/06/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/06/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/06/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/06/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/06/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/29/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/05/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/06/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/08/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/04/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/04/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/04/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/24/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/28/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/29/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/30/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/06/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew