Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/30/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/01/1997