Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 07/17/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/29/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/31/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/31/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/16/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/16/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/22/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/28/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/13/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/05/1998