Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 07/17/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/17/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/17/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 07/17/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/17/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/22/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/22/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/24/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/25/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/25/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/04/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/16/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/23/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/25/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/07/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/07/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/22/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew