Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/22/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/25/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/25/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/28/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/31/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/31/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/31/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/09/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/10/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/23/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/23/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/23/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/29/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 10/01/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/02/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/02/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/07/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/07/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/21/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/24/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/24/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/28/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/28/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/30/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/30/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/05/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/12/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/27/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/27/1998