Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/30/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/30/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/30/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/30/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/09/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/23/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/29/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/13/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/27/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/26/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/26/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/05/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/05/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/05/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/05/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/12/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/12/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/12/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/12/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/27/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/27/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/22/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/30/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/16/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/30/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/18/1998