Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 07/24/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 07/24/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/03/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/03/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/03/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/11/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/11/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/11/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/11/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/11/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/11/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/29/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/29/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/29/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/05/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/05/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/30/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/13/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/24/1998