Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/24/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/24/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/24/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/05/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/05/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/05/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/05/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/10/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/10/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/10/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/10/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/10/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/10/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/10/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/01/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/01/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/01/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/01/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/01/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/09/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/30/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/30/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/30/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/12/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 11/12/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/25/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/25/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/25/1998