Committees: H.R.2265 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/25/1997 Referred to
10/07/1997 Markup by
10/23/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-339
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property08/05/1997 Referred to
09/11/1997 Hearings by
09/30/1997 Markup by
09/30/1997 Reported by
Senate Judiciary11/05/1997 Referred to
11/13/1997 Discharged from